blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0834145

EP0834145 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREDICTING THE PRESENCE OF CONGENITAL AND ACQUIRED IMBALANCES AND THERAPEUTIC CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.09.2002  [2002/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioMérieux, Inc.
100 Akzo Avenue Treyburn
Durham, NC 27712 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
BioMérieux, Inc.
100 Akzo Avenue
Treyburn Durham, NC 27712 / US
Former [1998/15]For all designated states
AKZO NOBEL N.V.
Velperweg 76, Postbus 186
6800 LS Arnhem / NL
Inventor(s)01 / GIVENS, Thomas, B.
3522 Red Mountain Road
Rougemount, NC 27572 / US
02 / BRAUN, Paul
612 Kingsbury Drive
Durham, NC 27712 / US
03 / FISCHER, Timothy, J.
6405 Pernod Way
Raleigh, NC 27613 / US
[1998/15]
Representative(s)van Gent, Marieke
N.V. Organon Postbus 20
5340 BH Oss / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/15]Van Gent, Marieke
N.V. Organon, Postbus 20
5340 BH Oss / NL
Application number, filing date96917181.805.06.1996
[1998/15]
WO1996US08905
Priority number, dateUS1995047783907.06.1995         Original published format: US 477839
[1998/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9641291
Date:19.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0834145
Date:08.04.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0834145
Date:26.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.12.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:G06F19/00
[1998/15]
CPC:
G01N33/4905 (EP,KR,US); G16H10/40 (EP,KR,US); C07K16/18 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/86 (EP,KR,US); G01N35/00 (EP,KR,US); G16H10/60 (EP,KR,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,KR,US); G16H50/50 (EP,KR,US); G01N2800/226 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2800/385 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND APPARAT ZUM VORHERSAGEN DER PRÄSENZ VON ANGEBORENEN UND ERWORBENEN UNAUSGEWOGENHEITEN UND THERAPEUTISCHEN ZUSTÄNDEN[2000/52]
English:A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREDICTING THE PRESENCE OF CONGENITAL AND ACQUIRED IMBALANCES AND THERAPEUTIC CONDITIONS[1998/15]
French:METHODE ET APPAREIL POUR LA PREVISION DE LA PRESENCE DE DESEQUILIBRES CONGENITAUX ET ACQUIS ET CONDITIONS THERAPEUTIQUES[1998/15]
Former [1998/15]VERFAHREN UND APPARAT ZUM VORHERSAGEN DER PRÄSENZ VON KONGENIALEN UND ERWORBENEN UNAUSGEWOGENHEITEN UND THERAPEUTISCHEN ZUSTÄNDEN
Entry into regional phase07.01.1998National basic fee paid 
07.01.1998Search fee paid 
07.01.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/15]
17.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2001Fee for grant paid
02.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4217107  (SAITO YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-40 * column 3, line 15 - line 60 ** column 4, line 10 - column 7, line 38 *;
 [A]WO9505590  (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-40 * page 7, line 11 - page 9, line 15 * * page 10, line 19 - page 19, line 2 *;
 [A]  - SABBATINI R M E, "NEURAL NETWORKS FOR CLASSIFICATION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION OF BIOLOGICAL SIGNALS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY,US,NEW YORK, 1EEE, (19931028), vol. CONF. 15, page 265-266, XP000436749 [A] 1-40 * page 265, column L, line 13 - line 35 * * page 265, column R, line 21 - line 37 *
 [A]  - PATTICHIS C S ET AL, "EFFICIENT TRAINING OF NEURAL NETWORK MODELS IN CLASSIFICATION OF ELECTROMYOGRAPHIC DATA", MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING AND COMPUTING,GB,PETER PEREGRINUS LTD. STEVENAGE, (199505), vol. 33, no. 3, ISSN 0140-0118, page 499-503, XP000523900 [A] 1-40 * page 499, column L, line 1 - page 500, column R, line 31 * * page 502, column L, line 1 - page 503, column R, line 14 *
International search[A]US4199748  (BACUS JAMES W [US]);
 [A]US4998535  (SELKER HARRY P [US], et al);
 [A]US5156974  (GROSSMAN HYMAN [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.