EP0836749 - THYRISTOR WITH A LAYER OF CHARGE CARRIERS HAVING A REDUCED LIFETIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2001 [2001/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eupec Europäische Gesellschaft für Leistungshalbleiter mbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Strasse 5 59581 Warstein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states eupec Europäische Gesellschaft für Leistungshalbleiter mbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Strasse 5 59581 Warstein / DE | ||
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZE, Hans-Joachim Ottostrasse 60f D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Zedlitz, Peter OSRAM GmbH Intellectual Property IP Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96917345.9 | 13.06.1996 | [1998/17] | WO1996DE01052 | Priority number, date | DE1995124161 | 03.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19524161 | [1998/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702603 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836749 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836749 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/10, H01L29/32, H01L29/744 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
H01L29/66363 (EP);
H01L29/1016 (EP);
H01L29/32 (EP);
H01L29/744 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1998/17] | Title | German: | THYRISTOR MIT SCHICHT REDUZIERTER LADUNGSTRÄGERLEBENSDAUER | [1998/17] | English: | THYRISTOR WITH A LAYER OF CHARGE CARRIERS HAVING A REDUCED LIFETIME | [1998/17] | French: | THYRISTOR POURVU D'UNE COUCHE DE PORTEURS DE CHARGE A DUREE DE VIE REDUITE | [1998/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 27.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.11.2000 | [2001/27] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0651446 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * column W *; | [X]EP0297325 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8 * column W *; | [A]EP0343369 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 6,7 * column 3, line 34 - line 37; figure - *; | [A]JPH06276556 ; | [A]FR2344962 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 5 * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870905), vol. 11, no. 275, Database accession no. (E - 537), & JP6276556 A 19870408 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV LAB INC) [A] 6,7 * abstract * |