EP0833561 - FUNGICIDAL ACTIVE AGENT COMBINATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUTZMANN, Stefan Kosenberg 10 D-40721 Hilden / DE | 02 /
STENZEL, Klaus Seesener Strasse 17 D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
SIEBERT, Reinhard Drosselweg 46 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 04 /
KRÄMER, Wolfgang Rosenkranz 25 D-51399 Burscheid / DE | [1998/15] | Application number, filing date | 96917388.9 | 20.05.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996EP02167 | Priority number, date | DE1995119710 | 30.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19519710 | [1998/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9638040 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833561 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0833561 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/30, // (A01N43/30, 43:653) | [1998/15] | CPC: |
A01N43/30 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/30, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/30, A01N43/653 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/15] | Extension states | LT | 30.12.1997 | LV | 30.12.1997 | SI | 30.12.1997 | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE WIRKSTOFFKOMBINATIONEN | [1998/15] | English: | FUNGICIDAL ACTIVE AGENT COMBINATIONS | [1998/15] | French: | COMBINAISONS DE MATIERES ACTIVES FONGICIDES | [1998/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 25.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP0316970 (BAYER AG [DE]) [YD] 1-5* claim - *; | [YD]EP0627163 (BAYER AG [DE]) [YD] 1-5 * claim - * |