Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0833561
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.06.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] |
09.07.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] |
16.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.12.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.11.1998 |
First examination report |
|
20.11.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.02.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
20.02.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
16.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.1998 |
Change - extension states |
|
10.11.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|