Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5998696 | Global Dossier | 18.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0833561 | Global Dossier | 25.08.1999 | B1 | EP0833561 | 08.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG63523B | 30.04.2002 | B1 | BG102033 | 30.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59602890D1 | 30.09.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EE03731 | 17.06.2002 | B1 | EE9700289 | 15.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL184451B | 31.10.2002 | B1 | PL323592 | 14.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RO120373 | 30.01.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2143804 | 10.01.2000 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI0833561T | 31.12.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP96917388 | 20.05.1996 | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK284256B | 01.12.2004 | B6 | SK160097 | 08.04.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA47429 | 15.07.2002 | C2 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | EP9602167 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9638040 | Global Dossier | 05.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101199277 | 18.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1190868 | 19.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ294124 | 13.10.2004 | B6 | CZ375397 | 13.05.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19519710 | 05.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP960262 | 30.06.2000 | B1 | HRP960262 | 31.10.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU217829 | 28.04.2000 | B | HUP9801747 | 28.12.1998 | A3 | HUP9801747 | 30.11.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA964371 | 09.12.1996 | B | Priority number | Date | DE19519710 | 30.05.1995 |