EP0828906 - PLASTIC LIGHT WELL WITH COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEA MEISINGER Stahl und Kunststoff GmbH Sudetenstrasse 1 86551 Aichach / DE | [1998/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Xaver Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 28 D-86551 Aichach / DE | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96917405.1 | 22.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996EP02208 | Priority number, date | DE1995119228 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19519228 | [1998/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637671 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828906 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828906 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E04F17/06 | [1998/12] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1998/12] | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFF-LICHTSCHACHT MIT ABDECKUNG | [1998/12] | English: | PLASTIC LIGHT WELL WITH COVER | [1998/12] | French: | SOUPIRAIL EN PLASTIQUE A COUVERCLE | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 11.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.2001 | DK | 22.05.2001 | LU | 22.05.2001 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 22.05.2001 | |
DK | 22.05.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 22.05.2001 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE2548256 (NOACK WILLI HERMANN DIPL KFM D) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10,14,16 * page 6, line 21 - page 8, line 32; figures 1-3 * [Y] 11,12; | [A]DE2900313 (WOLFARTH FRIEDRICH) [A] 1,2,4,14* page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]DE2920361 (MAUTHE HANS) [Y] 11,12 * page 8, line 1 - page 11, line 8; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,2,6,14-17 |