EP0828479 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A SOLID DISPERSION OF A POORLY WATER SOLUBLE DRUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICOS CORPORATION 22021 20th Avenue, S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [2001/43] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states ICOS CORPORATION 22021 20th Avenue, S.E. Bothell, WA 98201 / US | ||
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTLER, James Matthew Glaxo Wellcome plc Park Road Ware Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Richardson, Kate, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Richardson, Kate, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/12] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96917457.2 | 30.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996EP02299 | Priority number, date | GB19950011220 | 02.06.1995 Original published format: GB 9511220 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9638131 | Date: | 05.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828479 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828479 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP);
A61K31/551 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/551, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FESTSTOFFDESPERSION EINES IM WASSER SCHWERLÖSLICHEN ARZNEIMITTEL | [1998/12] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A SOLID DISPERSION OF A POORLY WATER SOLUBLE DRUG | [1998/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE DISPERSION SOLIDE D'UN MEDICAMENT FAIBLEMENT HYDROSOLUBLE | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.10.2001 | BE | 24.10.2001 | CH | 24.10.2001 | FI | 24.10.2001 | LI | 24.10.2001 | NL | 24.10.2001 | DK | 24.01.2002 | PT | 24.01.2002 | SE | 24.01.2002 | GR | 25.01.2002 | IE | 30.05.2002 | LU | 30.05.2002 | MC | 30.05.2002 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
NL | 24.10.2001 | ||
DK | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
IE | 30.05.2002 | ||
LU | 30.05.2002 | ||
MC | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
NL | 24.10.2001 | ||
DK | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
IE | 30.05.2002 | ||
MC | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
NL | 24.10.2001 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
IE | 30.05.2002 | ||
MC | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
NL | 24.10.2001 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
MC | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
NL | 24.10.2001 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 24.10.2001 | |
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
NL | 24.10.2001 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 24.10.2001 | |
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 24.10.2001 | |
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 24.10.2001 | |
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 24.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0297866 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,11 * the whole document *; | [DX]EP0558104 (GLAXO SPA [IT]) [DX] 27-30 * page 40; example 45 ** page 41, line 40 - page 43, line 30 *; | [XP]WO9519978 (GLAXO LAB SA [FR], et al) [XP] 23-26,31,32 * page 32; example 1 * * page 71, line 25 - page 74, line 16 * |