EP0834321 - ORAL REMEDY FOR RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS AND FUNCTIONAL FOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON MEAT PACKERS, INC. 6-14, Minamihonmachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states NIPPON MEAT PACKERS, INC. 6-14, Minamihonmachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAMI, Tatsuyoshi +di / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Takashi Nippon Meat Packers, Inc., 3, Midorigahara 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-26 / JP | 03 /
TAGUCHI, Yasuki Nippon Meat Packers, Inc., 3, Midorigahara 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-26 / JP | 04 /
FUJITA, Kotaro Nippon Meat Packers, Inc., 3, Midorigahara 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-26 / JP | 05 /
AMETANI, Akio, Park Heim Bunkyo Nishikata 501 1-5, Nishikata 1-chome Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 113 / JP | 06 /
KAMINOGAWA, Syuichi 400-8, Masudashinden Kasukabe-shi, Saitama 344 / JP | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Polz, Leo, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Polz, Leo, Dr., et al Hoffmann Eitle Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/15] | Kolb, Helga, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96917679.1 | 13.06.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996JP01623 | Priority number, date | JP19950171486 | 13.06.1995 Original published format: JP 17148695 | [1998/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641644 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/56] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0834321 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0834321 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/39, A23L1/305, A61P19/02 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/15] | A61K38/39, A23L1/305 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/15] | Title | German: | ORALES MITTEL GEGEN RHEUMATISCHE ARTHRITIS UND FUNKTIONELLES NAHRUNGSMITTEL | [2002/47] | English: | ORAL REMEDY FOR RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS AND FUNCTIONAL FOOD | [1998/15] | French: | MEDICAMENT A ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE ORALE CONTRE LA POLYARTHRITE RHUMATOIDE ET ALIMENT FONCTIONNEL | [2002/47] |
Former [1998/15] | ORALES MITTEL GEGEN RHEUMATISCHE ARTHRITIS UND WIRKSAMES NAHRUNGSMITTEL | ||
Former [1998/15] | MEDICAMENT A ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE ORALE, CONTRE LA POLYARTHRITE RHUMATOIDE ET ALIMENT ACTIF | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.1998 | Translation filed | 13.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 13.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 10.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.05.2003 | FR | 02.05.2003 | IT | 02.05.2003 | NL | 02.05.2003 | DK | 02.08.2003 | SE | 02.08.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 02.05.2003 | |
FR | 02.05.2003 | ||
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 02.05.2003 | |
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | NL | 02.05.2003 | |
DK | 02.08.2003 | ||
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 02.05.2003 | |
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 02.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US5399347 (TRENTHAM DAVID E [US], et al); | [Y]JPH07138187 (NIPPON MEAT PACKERS, et al); | [AP]US5529786 (MOORE EUGENE R [US]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, 119:157794; & EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, Vol. 23, No. 7, (1993), p. 1588-94. |