EP0815191 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS IN TABLET FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2001 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARWICK, Jane Margaret, 8 Clifton Terrace Forest Hall Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9NP / GB | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [1999/41] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96917803.7 | 01.03.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996US02769 | Priority number, date | GB19950004963 | 11.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9504963 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9628530 | Date: | 19.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0815191 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.09.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/06, C11D3/08, C11D7/14, C11D7/16, C11D17/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
C11D3/046 (EP);
C11D17/0073 (EP);
C11D3/06 (EP);
C11D3/39 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/02] | Title | German: | WASCHMITTEL IN TABLETTENFORM | [1998/02] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS IN TABLET FORM | [1998/02] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DETERGENT SOUS FORME DE COMPRIME | [1998/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1997 | Search fee paid | 25.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/48] | 25.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3520817 (L.CALDWELL, S. GOLDWASSER) [X] 1-10 * column 3; example 1; claims 1-8; table A * | International search | [X]US4219436 ; | [Y]US3370015 ; | [Y]US4587031 ; | [YP]WO9507976 ; | [A]US4897212 ; | [A]EP0375022 |