EP0900402 - REFERENCE BEAM AUTO-FOCUS APPARATUS FOR MODULARIZED VOLUME-HOLOGRAPHIC MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles CA 90067-2199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | ||
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, California 90067-2199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REIS, James, J. 1442 Brett Place 26 San Pedro, CA 90732 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, Richard, L. 502 Judy Drive Redando Beach, CA 90277 / US | 03 /
STOLL, Howard, M. 29813 Knollview Drive Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90274 / US | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 96917804.5 | 21.05.1996 | [1999/10] | WO1996US05128 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9744697 | Date: | 27.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0900402 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900402 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/14, G03H1/22, G11C13/04, G11B7/00, G03H1/30 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
G03H1/26 (EP);
G11C13/042 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/10] | G02B27/14, G03H1/22, G11C13/04, G11B7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/10] | Title | German: | AUTOFOKUSVORRICHTUNG MIT REFERENZSTRAHL FÜR EINEN MODULAREN VOLUMENHOLOGRAPHISCHEN SPEICHER | [1999/10] | English: | REFERENCE BEAM AUTO-FOCUS APPARATUS FOR MODULARIZED VOLUME-HOLOGRAPHIC MEMORY | [1999/10] | French: | APPAREIL AUTO-FOCUS A FAISCEAU DE REFERENCE POUR MEMOIRE MODULAIRE DE VOLUMES HOLOGRAPHIQUES | [1999/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 26.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9632666 (NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORP) [E] 1-4,6 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4076370 (WAKO SHOJI) [A] 1 * column 1, line 27 - line 52 * * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 21 * * figure - *; | [A]US3635538 (CAULFIELD HENRY JOHN ET AL) [A] 1 * column 2, line 3 - line 56 * * figure - *; | [A]FR2254802 (THOMSON CSF) [A] 1 * page 2, line 10 - page 4, line 27 * * figure 1 * | International search | [X]US4449785 ; | [Y]US3826556 ; | [Y]USH738H ; | [AP]US5436867 ; | [A]US3703328 ; | [A]US3782802 ; | [A]US5128693 ; | [A]US3987421 |