EP0828749 - METHODS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF ORGANOPHOSPHORUS DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/12] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF ORGANOPHOSPHORUS DERIVATIVES | ||
[2002/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENTA INCORPORATED 3550 General Atomics Court San Diego California 92121 / US | For all designated states Polska Akademia Nauk Centrum Badan Molekularnych i Makromolekularnych, ul. Sienkiewicza 112 90-363 Lodz / PL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states GENTA INCORPORATED 3550 General Atomics Court San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states Polska Akademia Nauk Centrum Badan Molekularnych i Makromolekularnych, ul. Sienkiewicza 112 90-363 Lodz / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEC, Wojciech, J. Kolonia Wola Zardzynska PL-95-054 Ksawerow / PL | 02 /
WOZNIAK, Lucyna Piotrkowska 222 m6 PL-90-369 Lodz / PL | 03 /
RILEY, Timothy 9740 Limar Way San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96917829.2 | 24.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996US07639 | Priority number, date | PL19950308803 | 26.05.1995 Original published format: PL 30880395 | PL19950310248 | 01.09.1995 Original published format: PL 31024895 | PL19960312934 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: PL 31293496 | [1998/20] |
Former [1998/12] | PL19950308803 | 26.05.1995 | |
PL19950310248 | 31.08.1995 | ||
PL19960312934 | 26.02.1996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637503 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828749 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828749 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/04, C07H19/10, C07H19/048, C07H19/20, A61K31/70 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
C07H19/10 (EP);
C07H19/04 (EP);
C07H19/20 (EP);
C07H21/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON PHOSPHORORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2002/22] | English: | METHODS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF ORGANOPHOSPHORUS DERIVATIVES | [2002/22] | French: | PROCEDES DE SYNTHESE DE DERIVES ORGANOPHOSPHOREUX | [2002/22] |
Former [1998/12] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON PHOSPHORORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [1998/12] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF ORGANOPHOSPHORUS DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [1998/12] | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE SYNTHESE DE DERIVES ORGANOPHOSPHOREUX | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 03.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 20.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03001247.0 / EP1323727 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - L. A. WOZNIAK ET AL., "New stereospecific Method of Synthesis of dinucleoside methasulphonates", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 59, no. 20, pages 5843 - 5846, XP002074478 [X] 2,5-7,9,10,14-16 *Compounds 1 in scheme 1 and 2; Process of scheme 1* *Compounds 1 in scheme 1 and 2; Process of scheme 1* [A] 1,3,4 | [X] - W. BRILL AND M. CARUTHERS, "Synthesis of P-Diastereomeric resolution of nucleoside 3'-o-(s-alkyl) and nucleoside 3'-o(s-aryl) methylphosphonothioates", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 29, no. 11, pages 1227 - 1230, XP002074479 [X] 2,5-7 *see references 16,17,18* | International search | [Y]EP0136543 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |