EP0777505 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ESTIMATING PLATELET COUNTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | [2007/11] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Richard, I. 2335 Peach Tree Lane Northbrook, IL 60062 / US | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2006/15] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1997/24] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96917831.8 | 22.05.1996 | [1997/24] | WO1996US07672 | Priority number, date | US19950480601 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 480601 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640310 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777505 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777505 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, B01D21/30, A61M1/36 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A61M1/385 (EP,US);
A61M1/02 (EP,US);
A61M1/3672 (EP,US);
A61M1/3693 (EP,US);
A61M1/3696 (EP,US);
A61M1/0209 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0415, A61M2202/0092 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0427, A61M2202/0092 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2000/22] | A61M1/00, B01D21/30, B01D61/00, B01D61/22, B01D61/18, A61M1/02 | ||
Former IPC [1997/24] | A61M1/00, B01D21/30, B01D61/00, B01D61/22, B01D61/18 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/24] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÄTZEN DER BLUTPLÄTTCHENZAHL | [2006/24] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ESTIMATING PLATELET COUNTS | [1997/24] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES POUR ESTIMER DES NUMERATIONS PLAQUETTAIRES | [1997/24] |
Former [1997/24] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÄTZNEN DER BLUTPLÄTTCHENZAHL | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 24.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 16.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 14.03.2007 | [2008/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9119554 (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 4,10* page 21, line 27 - page 30, line 27; figure - *; | [X]WO9324157 (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 4 * page 7, line 10 - page 10, line 8; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0580299 (COBE LAB [US]) [A] 1-6,9,10 * page 5, line 27 - page 15, line 49; figure - *; | [X]GB2277464 (PALL CORP [US]) [X] 4 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 33 * * page 11, line 5 - page 13, line 1; figure - *; | [A]WO9503107 (BAXTER INT [US]) [A] 1-6,9,10 * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0654277 (COBE LAB [US]) [A] 1-6,9,10 * page 5, line 3 - page 17, line 47; figure - * | International search | [A]US5234608 (DUFF DANIEL H [US]); | [Y]EP0580299 (COBE LAB [US]); | [AP]US5427695 (BROWN RICHARD I [US]); | [YP]US5496265 (LANGLEY ROBERT W [US], et al) | Examination | - THOMSON C.B. ET AL, "The Pathophysiology and Clinical Relevance of Platelet Heterogenity", BLOOD, (1988), vol. 72, no. 1, pages 1 - 8 |