04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
15.06.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
20.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
16.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
07.07.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
23.06.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.06.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.03.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] |
14.02.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.12.2005 |
Change - German title |
published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
09.12.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.10.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.11.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.10.2002 |
First examination report |
|
21.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.08.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
07.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.07.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
29.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.03.2001 |
Request for preliminary examination |
|
15.12.2000 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] |
22.09.2000 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] |
22.09.2000 |
Change or deletion - publication of search report |
published on 22.09.2000 [2000/45] |
01.09.2000 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] |
04.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.01.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] |
23.01.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] |
08.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.12.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
04.09.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
23.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.07.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|