EP0827513 - REAGENTS FOR TREATMENT AND DIAGNOSTIC VISUALISATION, PARTICULARLY IN CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/11] | METHODS OF TREATMENT AND DIAGNOSTIC VISUALISATION, PARTICULARLY IN CANCER | ||
[2006/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strahilevitz, Meir P.O.Box 25008 Seattle, WA 98165 / US | [2006/20] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states Strahilevitz, Meir P.O.Box 190 Hansville, WA 98340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 96917832.6 | 24.05.1996 | [1998/11] | WO1996US07690 | Priority number, date | US19950451120 | 26.05.1995 Original published format: US 451120 | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637516 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827513 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827513 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/46, A61K39/44 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/6893 (EP,US);
A61K47/68 (EP,US);
A61K47/6891 (EP,US);
A61K51/1018 (EP,US);
A61K51/1045 (EP,US);
A61K9/1271 (EP,US);
C07K14/70514 (EP,US);
C07K16/1045 (EP,US);
C07K16/1292 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/11] | Title | German: | REAGENZIEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND ZUR DIAGNOSTISCHEN DARSTELLUNG SPEZIELL FÜR KREBS | [2006/06] | English: | REAGENTS FOR TREATMENT AND DIAGNOSTIC VISUALISATION, PARTICULARLY IN CANCER | [2006/06] | French: | RÉACTIFS DE TRAITEMENT, DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE VISUALISATION, NOTAMMENT DE TUMEURS CANCEREUSES | [2006/06] |
Former [1998/11] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND ZUR DIAGNOSTISCHEN DARSTELLUNG SPEZIELL FÜR KREBS | ||
Former [1998/11] | METHODS OF TREATMENT AND DIAGNOSTIC VISUALISATION, PARTICULARLY IN CANCER | ||
Former [1998/11] | PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT, DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE VISUALISATION, NOTAMMENT DE TUMEURS CANCEREUSES | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 08.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 09.08.2006 | SE | 09.11.2006 | ES | 20.11.2006 | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/16] | SE | 09.11.2006 | |
ES | 20.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9503084 (STRAHILEVITZ MEIR [US]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [X] - IMRAN AHMAD ET AL, "ANTIBODY-TARGETED DELIVERY OF DOXORUBICIN ENTRAPPED IN STERICALLY STABILIZED LIPOSOMES CAN ERADICATE LUNG CANCER IN MICE", CANCER RESEARCH,US,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, (19930401), vol. 53, no. 7, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1484 - 1488, XP000371716 [X] 1-4,10 * abstract * * page 1484, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 8 * | [X] - ALLEN T M ET AL, "ANTIBODY-MEDIATED TARGETING OF LONG-CIRCULATING (STEALTH R) LIPOSOMES", JOURNAL OF LIPOSOME RESEARCH,US,MARCEL DEKKER, NEW YORK, (19940301), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 0898-2104, pages 1 - 25, XP000450210 [X] 1-4,10 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 5, paragraph 2 * | International search | [Y]EP0302673 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [Y]EP0349127 (BIOMEMBRANE INST [US]); | [YP]WO9515770 (NEORX CORP [US]); | [YP]US5474772 (MADDOCK STEPHEN W [US]); | [Y] - WEINSTEIN J.N., "Target-Direction of Liposomes: Four Strategies for Attacking Tumor Cells", UCLA SYMPOSIUM MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, RATIONAL BASIS FOR CHEMOTHERAPY, (1983), pages 441 - 473 | [Y] - JONES M A, ET AL., "PREPARATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF LIGAND-MODIFIED LABELLED LIPOSOMES FOR SOLID PHASE IMMUNOASSAYS", JOURNAL OF LIPOSOME RESEARCH., TAYLOR & FRANCIS, PHILADELPHIA, PA., US, US, (19930101), vol. 03, no. 03, ISSN 0898-2104, pages 793 - 804, XP002940798 | [Y] - LESERMAN L D, ET AL., "TARGETING TO CELLS OF FLUORESCENT LIPOSOMES COVALENTLY COUPLED WITHMONOCLONAL ANTIBODY OR PROTEIN A", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19801211), vol. 288, doi:10.1038/288602a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 602 - 604, XP002940799 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/288602a0 | [X] - FLASHER D., ET AL., "LIPOSOME TARGETING TO HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1-INFECTED CELLS VIA RECOMBINANT SOLUBLE CD4 AND CD4 IMMUNOADHESIN (CD4-IGG).", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA., ELSEVIER, NL, NL, (19940101), vol. 1194., doi:10.1016/0005-2736(94)90219-4, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 185 - 196., XP000569129 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2736(94)90219-4 | [Y] - FANGER M W, SEGAL D M, WUNDERLICH J R, "GOING BOTH WAYS: BISPECIFIC ANTIBODIES AND TARGETED CELLULAR CYTOTOXICITY", The FASEB Journal, Federation of American Societies for Experimental Biology, US, US, (19900801), vol. 04, ISSN 0892-6638, pages 2846 - 2849, XP002940800 |