EP0836495 - DELIVERY OF OXYGEN-SUPERSATURATED PHYSIOLOGIC SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY 4043 Faculty/Administration Building Detroit, MI 48202 / US | [1998/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEARS, James, R. 615 Bridle Path Court Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 / US | 02 /
CRILLY, Richard, J. 935 Bartlet Wondsor, Ontario N9G 1V3 / CA | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/17] | Moreland, David, Dr. Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96917872.2 | 03.06.1996 | [1998/17] | WO1996US08083 | Priority number, date | US19950484279 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 484279 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640334 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836495 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836495 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/32, A61M37/00, B65D35/28, B65D83/00 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
A23L2/54 (EP,US);
A61K9/5089 (EP,US);
A61M1/1698 (EP,US);
A61M1/32 (EP,US);
A61M1/3613 (EP,US);
A61M25/0026 (EP,US);
A61M25/007 (EP,US);
B01F23/2319 (EP,US);
B01F23/237612 (EP,US);
B01F23/23762 (EP,US);
B01F23/29 (EP,US);
B01F23/454 (EP,US);
B01J13/04 (EP,US);
C01B13/00 (EP,US);
C01B13/02 (EP,US);
C01B5/00 (EP,US);
D21C9/147 (EP,US);
A61M1/1678 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0057 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0476 (EP,US);
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
B01F2101/2202 (EP,US);
B01F2101/305 (EP,US);
B01F2101/45 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0476, A61M2202/0007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/17] | A61M15/00, A61M37/00, B65D35/28, B65D83/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/17] | Title | German: | ABGABE VON SAUERSTOFFÜBERSÄTTIGTEN, PHYSIOLOGISCHEN LÖSUNGEN | [1998/17] | English: | DELIVERY OF OXYGEN-SUPERSATURATED PHYSIOLOGIC SOLUTIONS | [1998/17] | French: | ADMINISTRATION DE SOLUTIONS PHYSIOLOGIQUES SURSATUREES EN OXYGENE | [1998/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 05.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 25.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5084011 (GRADY DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1* claim 9 *; | [D]US5407426 (SPEARS JAMES R [US]); | [A]WO9513843 (UNIV WAYNE STATE [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 1 - line 18 * | International search | [A]US4039639 (KANKEL RICHARD L, et al); | [A]US4770168 (RUSZ TIBOR [US], et al); | [A]US5059182 (LAING DAVID H [CA]); | [A]US5119807 (ROBERTS JOSEPHINE A [US], et al); | [A]US5124088 (STUMPHAUZER WILLIAM C [US]); | [AP]US5507280 (HENKIN MELVYN L [US], et al) |