EP0859755 - WATER-BASED COMPOSITION CONTAINING AN AMINOPLAST-ETHER COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Süd-Chemie Inc. P.O. Box 32370 Louisville, KY 40232 / US | [2001/21] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states UNITED CATALYSTS, INC. 1230 South 13th Street Louisville, KT 40210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLANCY, Charles, W. 5107 Marina View Court Prospect, Kentucky 44059 / US | 02 /
STEINMETZ, Alan, L. 1833 Woodfill Way Louisville, KY 40205 / US | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | White, Martin Paul Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | White, Martin Paul Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1998/35] | McCall, John Douglas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 96918353.2 | 06.06.1996 | [1998/35] | WO1996US09559 | Priority number, date | US19950476209 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 476209 | [1998/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640626 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0859755 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C275/00, C07C275/04, C08L61/02, C09D7/00, C08G12/40, C08L61/20 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
C08G12/40 (EP,US);
C08L61/20 (EP,US);
C08L71/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L61/20, C08L2666/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1998/35] | Title | German: | AMINOPLAST-ETHER CPOPYMER ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF WASSERBASIS | [1998/35] | English: | WATER-BASED COMPOSITION CONTAINING AN AMINOPLAST-ETHER COPOLYMER | [1998/35] | French: | COMPOSITION A BASE D'EAU CONTENANT UN COPOLYMERE AMINOPLASTE-ETHER | [1998/35] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 06.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 22.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/06] | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4108816 (BROWN GEORGE L, et al) [X] 1,2,4,19,20,23,26-28,46-51,59,60* claims 1-5 * | International search | [X]US3756992 (DIETERICH D); | [X]US4093579 (DELAPP DARWIN FISKE, et al); | [Y]US4228055 (WALLACE DAVID R); | [Y]US4833177 (FALER DENNIS L [US], et al); | [Y]US5071904 (MARTIN ROXALANA L [US], et al); | [Y]US5084506 (FALER DENNIS L [US], et al); | [Y]US5276130 (BRADFORD CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) |