EP0843591 - POLYVINYL ALCOHOL-BASED MAGNETIC POLYMER PARTICLES, METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states chemagen Biopolymer-Technologie AG Arnold-Sommerfeld-Ring 2 52499 Baesweiler / DE | [2001/21] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states Müller-Schulte, Detlef Steppenbergallee 167 52074 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller-Schulte, Detlef, Dr. Steppenbergallee 167 52074 Aachen / DE | [2001/21] |
Former [1998/22] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, et al Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 96918662.6 | 03.06.1996 | [1998/22] | WO1996EP02398 | Priority number, date | DE1995128029 | 31.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19528029 | [1998/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9704862 | Date: | 13.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0843591 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0843591 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/00, C08F16/06, G01N33/546, B01D15/08, C07H1/06, C12Q1/68 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
C08J3/14 (EP,KR,US);
B03C1/01 (EP,US);
C07K16/26 (EP,US);
C08F16/06 (KR);
C08F261/04 (EP,US);
C08J3/16 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K9/08 (EP,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
G01N33/54326 (KR);
G01N33/5434 (EP,US);
H01F1/44 (EP,US);
C08J2329/04 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S435/815 (EP,US);
Y10S530/815 (EP,US);
Y10S530/816 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L29/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/22] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE POLYMERPARTIKEL AUF DER BASIS VON POLYVINYLALKOHOL, VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [1998/22] | English: | POLYVINYL ALCOHOL-BASED MAGNETIC POLYMER PARTICLES, METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE | [1998/22] | French: | PARTICULES POLYMERES MAGNETIQUES A BASE D'ALCOOL DE POLYVINYLE, PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE LES PRODUIRE ET UTILISATION | [1998/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 19.04.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4127657 (MUELLER SCHULTE DETLEF DR [DE])[A] 1-15 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS [A] 1-10 |