blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0842063

EP0842063 - PASSENGER RESTRAINT SYSTEM FOR THE BACKSEAT OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUDI AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/21]For all designated states
AUDI AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GÖTZ, Herwig
Rehsteig 8
D-85101 Lenting / DE
02 / OSTERMANN, Folkert
Am Schimmelskämpchen 9
D-40699 Erkrath / DE
[1998/21]
Representative(s)Engelhardt, Harald, et al
AUDI AG
Patentabteilung
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Engelhardt, Harald, et al
AUDI AG Patentabteilung
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
Former [1998/21]Engelhardt, Harald, et al
AUDI AG, Abteilung I/EK-P
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
Application number, filing date96918677.408.06.1996
[1998/21]
WO1996EP02494
Priority number, dateDE199512862704.08.1995         Original published format: DE 19528627
[1998/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9706035
Date:20.02.1997
Language:DE
[1997/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0842063
Date:20.05.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0842063
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.02.1997
ClassificationIPC:B60R21/20, B60R21/22
[1998/21]
CPC:
B60R21/21 (EP,US); B60R2021/161 (EP,US); B60R2021/23153 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [1998/21]
TitleGerman:INSASSENRÜCKHALTESYSTEM FÜR DEN RÜCKSITZ EINES FAHRZEUGES[1998/21]
English:PASSENGER RESTRAINT SYSTEM FOR THE BACKSEAT OF A VEHICLE[1998/21]
French:SYSTEME DE RETENUE POUR PASSAGERS OCCUPANT LA BANQUETTE ARRIERE D'UN VEHICULE[1998/21]
Entry into regional phase07.11.1997National basic fee paid 
07.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/21]
29.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US5251931  (SEMCHENA JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1,2;
 [A]US5348342  (HALAND YNGVE [SE], et al) [A] 1,2;
 [A]DE4018470  (GEN ENGINEERING BV [NL]) [A] 1,2;
 [A]GB2261636  (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [A] 1;
 [PA]DE1951585  (BAY OTTO) [PA] 1,3,4;
 [PA]GB2293355  (ALLIEDSIGNAL DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1,2
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.