blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0808565

EP0808565 - PREFABRICATED ARTIFICIAL BREADING UNITS FOR RABBITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mayoral Marquez, Jesus Serafin
Africa, 3
29600 Marbella, Malaga / ES
[1997/48]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/48]
Representative(s)Naranjo Marcos, Maria Antonia
Alesci Naranjo Propriedad Industrial SL
Paseo de la Habana 200
28036 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [1997/48]Naranjo Marcos, Maria Antonia
Paseo de la Habana 200
28036 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date96918700.420.06.1996
[1997/48]
WO1996ES00136
Priority number, dateES1996000057514.11.1995         Original published format: ES 9600575
[1997/48]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9717838
Date:22.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0808565
Date:26.11.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0808565
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.05.1997
ClassificationIPC:A01K1/02
[1997/48]
CPC:
A01K1/031 (EP); A01K1/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT [1997/48]
TitleGerman:VORGEFERTIGTE, KÜNSTLICHE ZUCHTABTEILUNG FÜR KANINCHEN[1997/48]
English:PREFABRICATED ARTIFICIAL BREADING UNITS FOR RABBITS[1997/48]
French:VIVIERS ARTIFICIELS PREFABRIQUES POUR LAPINS[1997/48]
Entry into regional phase04.07.1997Translation filed 
02.07.1997National basic fee paid 
02.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/05]
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.1999Fee for grant paid
23.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE19.01.2000
IT19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
DE20.04.2000
GB20.06.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2002/11]BE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
DE20.04.2000
GB20.06.2000
Former [2001/28]BE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
GB20.06.2000
Former [2001/09]BE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/08]BE19.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US5289795  (MOHILEF) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 63 - line 69 *;
 [A]FR2534113  (ELANTKOWSKI) [A] 1-6;
 [A]FR2342649  (AVIREM) [A] 1-6 * figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.