EP0872053 - TRANSMISSION OF MULTIMEDIA OBJECTS IN A DIGITAL BROADCASTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OY NOKIA AB Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALOMÄKI, Ari Auertie 7 C 42 FIN-04400 Järvenpää / FI | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Brax, Matti Juhani, et al Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Brax, Matti Juhani, et al Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 96918705.3 | 12.06.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996FI00348 | Priority number, date | FI19950002880 | 12.06.1995 Original published format: FI 952880 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9642144 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/56] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872053 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
H04H20/46 (EP,US);
H04H20/72 (EP,US);
H04H20/95 (EP,US);
H04N21/233 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/23617 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4351 (EP,US);
H04N21/8166 (EP,US);
H04N21/8543 (EP,US);
H04N21/858 (EP,US);
H04H2201/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1998/43] | Title | German: | UBERTRAGUNG VON MULTIMEDIAOBJEKTE IN EINEM DIGITALRUNDFUNKSYSTEM | [1998/43] | English: | TRANSMISSION OF MULTIMEDIA OBJECTS IN A DIGITAL BROADCASTING SYSTEM | [1998/43] | French: | TRANSMISSION D'OBJETS MULTIMEDIA DANS UN SYSTEME DE DIFFUSION NUMERIQUE | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 31.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9508226 (METEOMEDIA INC [CA], et al); | [A]US5404505 (LEVINSON FRANK H [US]) | [AP] - IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION AND SYSTEMS, Volume E79-D, No. 6, June 1996, HYUNGSEOK CHUNG et al., "MEMORI: MHEG Engine for Multimedia Information Object Retrieval and Interchange", pages 680-686. | by applicant | - H. CHUNG; K. CHUNG, "MEMORI: MHEG Engine for Multimedia Information Object Retrieval and Interchange", IEICE TRANS. INF.&SYST., (199606), vol. E79-D, no. 6 |