EP0956079 - INJECTION DART SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY Five Giralda Farms Madison New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states American Cyanamid Company Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODRUFF, Keith, Floyd 1331 Summit Lane Mountainside, NJ 07092 / US | 02 /
PETERSON, David, Alan 5193 Meadowbrook Place Pipersville, PA 18947 / US | 03 /
EAGER, Kendra, Beth 37 Nathan Court Newtown, PA 18940 / US | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Mannion, Sally Kim Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Mannion, Sally Kim, Dr. c/o Wyeth Laboratories, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96919086.7 | 05.06.1996 | [1999/46] | WO1996US08872 | Priority number, date | US19950473346 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 473346 | US19950473347 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 473347 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640351 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956079 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M31/00, A61D7/00 | [2001/06] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1999/46] | A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Extension states | AL | 03.12.1997 | LT | 03.12.1997 | LV | 03.12.1997 | SI | 03.12.1997 | Title | German: | INJEKTIONSWURFPFEILSYSTEM | [1999/46] | English: | INJECTION DART SYSTEM | [1999/46] | French: | SYSTEME DE FLECHETTES A IMPLANT | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 03.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.12.1997 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 20.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 29.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1366039 (SMITH L C) [X] 1,2,8 * page 1, line 32 - line 87; figure - * [A] 13,14; | [A]GB1591226 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [A] 1-5,9,10,13,14 * page 5, line 115 - page 6, line 25; figure - *; | [A]US4687480 (LABY RALPH H [AU], et al) [A] 1,9,13 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9319698 (DARATECH PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1,13* abstract * | International search | [Y]US3277893 (CLARK ROBERT M); | [X]US3948263 (DRAKE JR JAMES F, et al); | [Y]US4561445 (BERKE JOSEPH J [US], et al); | [A]US4713053 (LEE HANS [US]); | [Y]US4889529 (HAINDL HANS [DE]); | [Y]US4905397 (JUELG JR JAMES E [US]); | [X]US5300079 (NIEZINK HERMAN [NL], et al) |