EP0830368 - NOVEL CARBAMATE-BASED CATIONIC LIPIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promega Biosciences, Inc. 2800 Woods Hollow Road Madison, Wisconsin 53711-5399 / US | [1999/52] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states GENTA INCORPORATED 3550 General Atomics San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARTZ, David, Aaron 1544 Valeda Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Bob, Dale 445 North Willow Spring Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 03 /
DWYER, Brian, Patrick 13639 Comuna Drive Poway, CA 92064 / US | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Polz, Leo, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Polz, Leo, Dr., et al Hoffmann Eitle Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/13] | Kolb, Helga, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96919222.8 | 05.06.1996 | [1998/13] | WO1996US09553 | Priority number, date | US19950483465 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 483465 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640726 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830368 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, C07C269/00, C07D233/61 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
C07C271/20 (EP,US);
C07J41/0055 (EP,US);
C07J43/003 (EP,US);
C07J51/00 (EP,US);
C07K5/0205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/13] | Title | German: | AUF CARBAMAT BASIERENDE KATIONISCHE LIPIDE | [1998/13] | English: | NOVEL CARBAMATE-BASED CATIONIC LIPIDS | [1998/13] | French: | NOUVEAUX LIPIDES CATIONIQUES A BASE DE CARBAMATE | [1998/13] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 04.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 08.09.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5171678 (BEHR JEAN-PAUL [FR], et al); | [A]US5283185 (EPAND RICHARD M [CA], et al); | [A]US4680290 (CASSAL JEAN-MARIE [FR]); | [A]US4897355 (EPPSTEIN DEBORAH A [US], et al); | [A]US5334761 (GEBEYEHU GULILAT [US], et al) | [AP] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Volume 270, No. 52, issued 29 December 1995, GUY-CAFFEY et al., "Novel Polyaminolipids Enhance The Cellular Uptake of Oligonucleotides", pages 31391-31395. |