EP0820542 - INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING AT LEAST ONE KNITTED RIBBON INCLUDING CROCHETED RUBBER THREADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXTILMA AG Seestrasse 97 6052 Hergiswil / NW / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states Textilma AG Seestrasse 97 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEICH, Francisco Bleumattstrasse 10 CH-5264 Gipf-Oberfrick / CH | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Schmauder, Klaus Dieter, et al Schmauder & Partner AG Patentanwälte Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Schmauder, Klaus Dieter, et al Schmauder & Wann Patentanwaltsbüro Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 96919523.9 | 13.06.1996 | [1998/05] | WO1996CH00226 | Priority number, date | DE1995209993U | 20.06.1995 Original published format: DE 29509993 U | [1998/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9700987 | Date: | 09.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820542 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820542 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D04B23/06 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
D04B21/18 (EP);
D04B23/06 (EP,KR);
D04B21/202 (EP);
D04B27/10 (EP);
D10B2403/0311 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/05] | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG MINDESTENS EINES WIRKBANDES MIT UMHÄKELTEN GUMMIFÄDEN | [1998/05] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING AT LEAST ONE KNITTED RIBBON INCLUDING CROCHETED RUBBER THREADS | [1998/05] | French: | INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION D'AU MOINS UNE BANDE DE TRICOT AVEC INSERTION DE FILS ELASTIQUES CROCHETES | [1998/05] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3258941 (ANTONIO FORMENTI) [A] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 36; figures 1-11 *; | [A]FR2182402 (TEXEL SA [FR]); | [DA]DE4328951 (MUENCHBERGER BAND & GURT [DE]); | [DA]DE2264297 (CHEYNET ET SES FILS SAINT JUST) |