EP0825879 - PROCESS FOR THE DEPYROGENATION OF INJECTABLE PHARMACEUTICAL SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRACCO IMAGING S.p.A. Via E. Folli, 50 20134 Milano / IT | [2005/43] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Bracco Imaging S.p.A. Via E. Folli, 50 20134 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1998/10] | For:DE
FR
IT
BRACCO S.p.A. Via E. Folli, 50 20134 Milano / IT | ||
For:GB
IE
DIBRA S.p.A. Piazza Velasca, 5 I-20122 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORANDI, Ervino Via E. Folli, 50 I-20134 Milano / IT | 02 /
GALLOTTI, Angelo Via E. Folli, 50 I-20134 Milano / IT | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio, et al Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Minoja, Fabrizio, et al Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1998/10] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96919732.6 | 09.05.1996 | [1998/10] | WO1996EP01953 | Priority number, date | IT1995MI00987 | 16.05.1995 Original published format: IT MI950987 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9636370 | Date: | 21.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825879 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825879 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/02, B01D61/14, A61K9/00, A61K9/08 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
B01D61/147 (EP,US);
A61K49/0452 (EP,US);
A61K49/18 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61L2/0017 (EP,US);
B01D61/145 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/10] | A61L2/00, B01D61/14, A61K9/00, A61K9/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [1998/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DEPYROGENIERUNG INJIZIERBARER PHARMAZEUTISCHER LÖSUNGEN | [2005/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE DEPYROGENATION OF INJECTABLE PHARMACEUTICAL SOLUTIONS | [1998/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE DEPYROGENATION DE SOLUTIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES INJECTABLES | [1998/10] |
Former [1998/10] | VERFAHREN ZUR DEPYROGENIERUNG INJEZIERBARER PHARMAZEUTISCHER LÖSUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 24.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0422491 ; | [A]EP0113040 (INTERMEDICAT GMBH [CH]); | [Y]EP0312104 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al); | [A]US4925690 (ODAKE YOSHINOBU [JP]); | [A]WO9200132 (COULTER CORP [US]); | [Y]WO9214539 (BRACCO SPA [IT], et al); | [A]GB2269166 (PALL CORP [US]); |