EP0766521 - BALL-CONTACTING PAD FOR SPORT SHOE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADIDAS AG Adi-Dassler-Strasse 1-2 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [1997/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIEFENBACHER, Konrad Parkstrasse 15 D-76131 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
BRIANT, Antoine Zeltnerstr. 25 D-90443 Nürnberg / DE | [1997/30] |
Former [1997/15] | 01 /
TIEFENBACHER, Konrad Parkstrasse 15 D-76131 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02 /
BRIANT, Antoine Hauptendorferstrasse D-91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Representative(s) | Geissler, Bernhard, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/15] | Geissler, Bernhard, Dr. jur., Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96919976.9 | 18.04.1996 | [1997/15] | WO1996IB00582 | Priority number, date | US19950423405 | 18.04.1995 Original published format: US 423405 | [1997/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9632856 | Date: | 24.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0766521 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/02 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
A43B5/025 (EP);
A43B5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/15] | Title | German: | BALLKONTAKTFLÄCHE FÜR SPORTSCHUH | [1997/15] | English: | BALL-CONTACTING PAD FOR SPORT SHOE | [1997/15] | French: | BOURRELETS DE CONTACT AVEC LE BALLON POUR CHAUSSURE DE SPORT | [1997/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 03.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.06.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   06.08.1997 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.1998 | 30.04.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0496931 (RUTIL) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2743666 (D. DEKANIC) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2259639 (QUASERSPORT) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2248171 (S. GRAYSMARK) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US3650051 (W. SASS) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2255628 (M. BRANDT) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1805045U (A. DIHLMANN) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document * |