EP0777828 - COMPRESSOR STALL AVOIDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/24] | COMPRESSOR STALL DIAGNOSTICS AND AVOIDANCE | ||
[2001/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERTZ, Jeffrey, B. 106 North Saddle Ridge Drive West Simsbury, CT 06092 / US | 02 /
SHARMA, Om, Parkash 85 Wilshire Road Vernon, CT 06066 / US | 03 /
EVEKER, Kevin, M. 66 Finley Hill Road Marlborough, CT 06447 / US | 04 /
NETT, Carl, N. 64 Pine Hill Road Tolland, CT 06084 / US | 05 /
GYSLING, Daniel L., Apartment 19332 299 Buckland Hills Drive Manchester, CT 06040 / US | 06 /
FEULNER, Matthew, R. 57 Woodhenge Drive Tolland, CT 06084 / US | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96920104.5 | 17.04.1996 | [1997/24] | WO1996US05309 | Priority number, date | US19950427334 | 24.04.1995 Original published format: US 427334 | US19960013187 | 12.03.1996 Original published format: US 13187 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9634207 | Date: | 31.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777828 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777828 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F04D27/02 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
F04D27/001 (EP);
F04D27/0223 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/24] | Title | German: | VERMEIDUNG DES PUMPENS EINES VERDICHTERS | [2001/32] | English: | COMPRESSOR STALL AVOIDANCE | [2001/32] | French: | EVITEMENT DU CALAGE DE COMPRESSEURS | [2001/32] |
Former [1997/24] | DIAGNOSE UND VERMEIDUNG DES PUMPENS EINES VERDICHTERS | ||
Former [1997/24] | COMPRESSOR STALL DIAGNOSTICS AND AVOIDANCE | ||
Former [1997/24] | DIAGNOSTIC ET EVITEMENT DU CALAGE DE COMPRESSEURS | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 03.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Request for further processing for: | 14.06.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 14.06.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.03.1997 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.03.1997 | 23.03.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.03.1997 | 23.03.1997 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.03.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0628727 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES) [A] 1,2,10,14-16,18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0597440 (HITACHI) [A] 1,10,14-16,18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0401152 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES); | [A]DE2802247 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES); | [A]US5275528 (FREEMAN) |