EP0829027 - ROBUST SPECTROSCOPIC OPTICAL PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHANAN, Norma, Lindsey P.O. Box 7072 Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 02 /
ALSMEYER, Daniel, Charles 104 Shadow Wood Lane Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Gregory, Wayne 204 Park Ridge Court Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 04 /
EDWARDS, Roger, Dale Route 1, Box 279 Blackwater, VA 24221 / US | 05 /
NICELY, Vincent, Alvin 2605 Suffolk Street Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 96920159.9 | 11.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996US06528 | Priority number, date | US19950450597 | 25.05.1995 Original published format: US 450597 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637794 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0829027 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0829027 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42, G02B6/38, C03C27/02, G01J3/02 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
G02B6/3855 (EP,US);
G02B6/42 (KR);
G01N21/8507 (EP,US);
G02B6/241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/12] | Title | German: | ROBUSTE SPEKTROSKOPISCHE SONDE | [1998/12] | English: | ROBUST SPECTROSCOPIC OPTICAL PROBE | [1998/12] | French: | SONDE OPTIQUE SPECTROSCOPIQUE ROBUSTE | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.01.1999 | BE | 27.01.1999 | CH | 27.01.1999 | FI | 27.01.1999 | FR | 27.01.1999 | GR | 27.01.1999 | LI | 27.01.1999 | SE | 27.01.1999 | DK | 27.04.1999 | PT | 27.04.1999 | IE | 11.05.1999 | LU | 11.05.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
CH | 27.01.1999 | ||
FI | 27.01.1999 | ||
GR | 27.01.1999 | ||
LI | 27.01.1999 | ||
SE | 27.01.1999 | ||
DK | 27.04.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
LU | 11.05.1999 | ||
FR | 25.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
CH | 27.01.1999 | ||
FI | 27.01.1999 | ||
GR | 27.01.1999 | ||
LI | 27.01.1999 | ||
SE | 27.01.1999 | ||
DK | 27.04.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
FR | 25.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
CH | 27.01.1999 | ||
FI | 27.01.1999 | ||
GR | 27.01.1999 | ||
LI | 27.01.1999 | ||
SE | 27.01.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
FR | 25.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
CH | 27.01.1999 | ||
FI | 27.01.1999 | ||
GR | 27.01.1999 | ||
LI | 27.01.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
FR | 25.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
CH | 27.01.1999 | ||
GR | 27.01.1999 | ||
LI | 27.01.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
FI | 28.04.1999 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
FR | 25.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
CH | 27.01.1999 | ||
LI | 27.01.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
FI | 28.04.1999 | ||
IE | 11.05.1999 | ||
FR | 25.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
FI | 28.04.1999 | ||
CH | 03.05.1999 | ||
LI | 03.05.1999 | ||
FR | 25.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
BE | 27.01.1999 | ||
PT | 27.04.1999 | ||
FI | 28.04.1999 | ||
FR | 25.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | AT | 27.01.1999 | |
FR | 25.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 27.01.1999 | Cited in | International search | [DYA]US4033668 (PRESBY HERMAN MELVIN) [DY] 1-7 * column 3, line 37 - line 57; figure - * [A] 8-10; | [YA]US4488773 (WAGNER ROBERT A [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 3, line 13 - line 20 * * column 5, line 11 - line 26 * * column 7, line 36 - line 42 * * column 7, line 46 - line 50 * * column 8, line 3 - line 13; figure - * [A] 8-10; | [YA]WO9420013 (SAHAGEN ARMEN N [US]) [Y] 1-7 * page 18 - page 21; figures 1,3,6-8,10 *[A] 8 |