EP0865311 - METHOD OF DELIVERING SUBSTANCE INTO A MATERIAL MASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reed, William C. 5753 Whistlewood Circle Sarasota, FL 34232 / US | [1998/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/39] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96920218.3 | 15.05.1996 | [1998/39] | WO1996US06943 | Priority number, date | US19950441978 | 16.05.1995 Original published format: US 441978 | [1998/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9637283 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0865311 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01F15/00, B01F13/00, C02F1/48, B05D3/00, C04B40/00, A47J31/00, A61K7/06, A61K7/48, A01G7/04, A23L1/00 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A01G7/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/02 (EP,US);
B05D1/00 (EP,US);
B05D3/12 (EP,US);
B05D3/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/39] | Extension states | AL | 10.12.1997 | LT | 10.12.1997 | LV | 10.12.1997 | SI | 10.12.1997 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINBRINGEN EINER SUBSTANZ IN EINE MATERIALMASSE | [1998/39] | English: | METHOD OF DELIVERING SUBSTANCE INTO A MATERIAL MASS | [1998/39] | French: | PROCEDE D'APPORT D'UNE SUBSTANCE DANS UNE MASSE DE MATIERE | [1998/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 10.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/27] | 11.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU1081259 ; | [X]SU881050 ; | [A]SU615238 ; | [X]RU2026266 ; | [A]SU944930 ; | [XA]DE1692771 (SEUSS WILLY DR MED) [X] 1 * claims 1-11 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 22, paragraph 3 - page 23, paragraph 2 * * page 30, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 33, paragraph 1 - page 34, paragraph 3 * [A] 2-10; | [X]GB2206064 (HITACHI ELEVATOR ENG) [X] 1 * claim 1 * * page 2, lines 14-22 * * page 33, lines 17-24 * * page 39, lines 4-9; figures 1,8,14 *; | [X]EP0333892 (BOSSERT GERDI) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 7 *; | [X]US4888113 (HOLCOMB ROBERT R [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]WO9009132 (HVARRE JOHN NIKOLAJ [DK]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]WO9105739 (MERCIER DOMINIQUE [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 26, line 11 - page 27, line 9 * * claims 1,3,10 *; | [XA]WO9401005 (NOVATECH INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * page 2, lines 10-16 * * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 23 * * figure 3; claims 1-32 * * abstract * [A] 2-8,10; | [XA]WO9428877 (NOVATECH INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 30; figure 4 * [A] 2-8,10; | [X]US5411143 (GREENE DON [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * claims 1-9 * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 30 *; | [XP]US5415900 (REED WILLIAM C [US]) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 46, Database accession no. 84-287275, XP002071321 & SU1081259 A 00000000 (LENGD ENG CONS INST) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 36, Database accession no. 82-76390E, XP002071322 & SU881050 B 00000000 (KOROTKEVICH G M) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 22, Database accession no. 79-41814B, XP002071323 & SU615238 A 00000000 (KAZMEKKANOBR RES) [A] 1,2,9 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 32, Database accession no. 95-244710, XP002071324 & RU2026266 C 00000000 (YUROVSKII S M) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 21, Database accession no. 83-H0843K, XP002071325 & SU944930 B 00000000 (LENINGRADORGSTROI) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]US3136650 (AVILA FRANK C) |