EP0828656 - ELECTRO-MAGNETIC EXPULSION DE-ICING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INNOVATIVE DYNAMICS, INC. Cornell Research Park, 95 Brown Road, 244 Langmuir Lab Ithaca, NY 14850-1252 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states Innovative Dynamics, Inc. Cornell Research Park, 95 Brown Road, 244 Langmuir Lab Ithaca, NY 14850-1252 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INGRAM, Richard, B. 78 Dodge Road Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 02 /
CODNER, Gerald, W. 75 Murfield Drive Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 03 /
GERARDI, Joseph, J. 81 Crystal Drive Dryden, NY 13053 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Berger, Helmut, et al Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Berger, Helmut, et al Cabinet WEINSTEIN 20, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96920269.6 | 17.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996US07152 | Priority number, date | US19950449628 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: US 449628 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637406 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828656 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828656 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B64D15/16, H01F7/20 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
H01F7/20 (EP,US);
B64D15/163 (EP,US);
H01F17/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1998/12] | Title | German: | ENTEISUNGSSYSTEM MIT ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEM AUSWURF | [1998/12] | English: | ELECTRO-MAGNETIC EXPULSION DE-ICING SYSTEM | [1998/12] | French: | SYSTEME DE DEGIVRAGE PAR EXPULSION ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 02.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Request for further processing for: | 05.05.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]NL7710368 (BOEING CO) [X] 1,11 * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 13 * [A] 2,3; | [XA]FR1491905 (AUER) [X] 1,4-6,11 * page 1, column 1, line 35 - page 2, column 2, line 3 * [A] 14,15,18-20; | [A]WO9428969 (AUSTRALASIAN MED TECH [NZ], et al) [A] 1,10,11,30 * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 1 * * page 12, line 21 - line 32 *; | [A]US3231842 (BROWER DAVID F, et al) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 40 - line 67 *; | [A]GB2251417 (ELECTROIMPACT INC [US]) [A] 31,34,50 * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 9 *; | [A]US5022612 (BERSON BERLE D [US]) [A] 31,50 * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 14 * |