Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001502161 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US45094495 | 23.05.1995 | US9607709 | 23.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU723916B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2000 | B2 | AU5877396 | 11.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US45094495 | 23.05.1995 | US9607709 | 23.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0836481 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2001 | A4 | EP0836481 | 22.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45094495 | 23.05.1995 | US9607709 | 23.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9637218 | Global Dossier | 28.11.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45094495 | 23.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2221818 | 28.11.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45094495 | 23.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5789194 | 04.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US45094495 | 23.05.1995 |