EP0773736 - READILY OPENABLE POP-UP DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.05.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nice-Pak Products, Inc. Two Nice-Pak Park Orangeburg, NY 10962-1376 / US | [1997/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JULIUS, Robert, P. 11 Hycliff Road Greenwich, CT 06831 / US | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96920500.4 | 24.05.1996 | [1997/21] | WO1996US07721 | Priority number, date | US19950450493 | 26.05.1995 Original published format: US 450493 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637139 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773736 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/32, B65D83/08 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
B65D75/5894 (EP,US);
A47K10/421 (EP,US);
B65D83/0805 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3266 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/21] | A47K10/24, B65D85/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/21] | Title | German: | EINFACH ZU ÖFFNENDES SCHNELLSPENDER | [1997/21] | English: | READILY OPENABLE POP-UP DISPENSER | [1997/21] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR A EXTRACTION MANUELLE INSTANTANEE, FACILE A OUVRIR | [1997/21] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 25.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 03.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/25] | 29.01.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4535912 (BONK JOSEPH P [US]) [X] 1-8,16 * the whole document *; | [X]US3967756 (BARISH ROBERT A) [X] 1-8,16 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4735317 (SUSSMAN CHARLES M [US], et al) |