EP0837638 - LOW WATER ACTIVITY EGG PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PILLSBURY COMPANY 200 South Sixth Street Minneapolis, MN 55402-1464 / US | [2002/50] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states THE PILLSBURY COMPANY 200 South 6th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55402-1464 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHATIA, Usha, B. 2020 Brenner Avenue Roseville, MN 55113 / US | 02 /
GRAVES, John, R. 55 Mobile Manor Shakopee, MN 55379 / US | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/18] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96920518.6 | 24.05.1996 | [1998/18] | WO1996US07778 | Priority number, date | US19950475860 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 475860 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9639873 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837638 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837638 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/32, A23B5/05, A21D13/08, A21D2/26 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
A23L15/30 (EP,US);
A21D13/38 (EP,US);
A21D2/262 (EP,US);
A23B5/025 (EP,US);
A23B5/05 (EP,US);
A23B5/14 (EP,US);
A23L15/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/18] | Title | German: | EIPRODUKT MIT NIEDRIGEM WASSERAKTIVITÄT | [1998/18] | English: | LOW WATER ACTIVITY EGG PRODUCT | [1998/18] | French: | PRODUIT A BASE D'OEUFS A FAIBLE ACTIVITE D'EAU | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 29.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.12.2002 | BE | 11.12.2002 | CH | 11.12.2002 | FI | 11.12.2002 | FR | 11.12.2002 | IT | 11.12.2002 | LI | 11.12.2002 | NL | 11.12.2002 | DK | 11.03.2003 | PT | 11.03.2003 | SE | 11.03.2003 | LU | 24.05.2003 | IE | 26.05.2003 | MC | 31.05.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
FR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
LU | 24.05.2003 | ||
IE | 26.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
LU | 24.05.2003 | ||
IE | 26.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
LU | 24.05.2003 | ||
IE | 26.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
BE | 11.12.2002 | ||
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 11.12.2002 | |
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 11.03.2003 | |
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 11.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1686556 (GRISWOLD GLENN G) [A] 20-22* the whole document *; | [A]GB327701 (ALBERT KUBA EPSTEIN) [A] 1-5 * page 1; claims 1,4,9-11 * * page 5, lines 51-66 *; | [XY]GB346794 (ALBERT KUBA EPSTEIN) [X] 1-5,8 * page 1, column R - page 2, column L; claims 1,2,6,8-11,13,14 * * pages 3-4 * * page 5, column R * [Y] 5-7,14,15; | [XA]US2142510 (HARRIS BENJAMIN R, et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9 * page 3, column R, line 69 - page 4, column L, line 74 * * page 1, column L, line 51 - page 1, column R, line 3; claims 1,2,8,18 * [A] 6,7,11-16; | [XA]US2176080 (KATZMAN MORRIS B) [X] 1-3,5,8,9 * page 1, column R; claims 4,14 * * page 6, column R * [A] 6; | [A]US4313967 (KAHN MARVIN L, et al) [A] 1,2,10 * example 33 *; | [A]EP0149517 (NABISCO BRANDS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,8,9,11,12,16 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 4 * * page 12; example 4; claims 1,4,10,11 *; | [Y]US5028448 (ROS ALBERT J [NL]) [Y] 5-7,14,15 * columns 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9307796 (KOESSL LEOPOLD [AT]) [A] 20-22 * pages 2-6 *; | [A]WO9504468 (PILLSBURY CO [US]) [A] 1,5-8,10,11,14-17,21 * page 7, line 22 - page 10, line 21; claims 1,6,10,12-15,25,29,30 * * pages 2-3 * |