EP0833713 - Cutting tool and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/15] | CUTTING INSERT, CUTTING TOOL AND METHOD | ||
[2003/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seco Tools AB 737 82 Fagersta / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states SECO TOOLS AB S-737 82 Fagersta / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEDT, Robert Rönningsvägen 8 S-737 31 Fagersta / SE | 02 /
EKLUND, Sven Källstigen 10 S-737 33 Fagersta / SE | 03 /
RIVIERE, Bertrand 2, allée Emanuel-Kant F-18000 Bourges / FR | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Taquist, Lennart, et al Sandvik AB Patent Department 811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE | Application number, filing date | 96921186.1 | 18.06.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996SE00784 | Priority number, date | SE19950002254 | 21.06.1995 Original published format: SE 9502254 | [1998/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9700750 | Date: | 09.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833713 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0833713 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/22, B23B27/10 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
B23C5/2213 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/0422 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/045 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/125 (EP,US);
B23C2200/126 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/167 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/168 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2210/168 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T407/191 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/15] | Title | German: | Schneidwerkzeug und Methode | [2003/32] | English: | Cutting tool and method | [2003/32] | French: | Outil de coupe et procédé | [2003/32] |
Former [1998/15] | SCHNEIDEINSATZ, SCHNEIDWERKZEUG UND METHODE | ||
Former [1998/15] | CUTTING INSERT, CUTTING TOOL AND METHOD | ||
Former [1998/15] | INSERT DE COUPE, OUTIL DE COUPE ET PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 20.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 17.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.04.2004 | [2004/40] | Cited in | International search | [A]US1838520 (JOHN ARCHER); | [A]EP0300172 (GTE VALENITE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0458003 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE]); | [A]US5147158 (RIVIERE BERTRAND [FR]); | [A]US5346336 (RESCIGNO PASQUALE F [US]) |