EP0833894 - RAPAMCYCIN-BASED REGULATION OF BIOLOGICAL EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARIAD GENE THERAPEUTICS, INC. 26 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139-4234 / US | [2008/28] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states ARIAD GENE THERAPEUTICS, INC. 26 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLACKSON, Timothy 25 Ivaloo Street Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 02 /
HOLT, Dennis, A. 7 Brookmill Road Stow, MA 01775 / US | 03 /
GILMAN, Michael, Z. 555 Chestnut Street Newton, MA 02168 / US | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Jaenichen, Hans-Rainer Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Jaenichen, Hans-Rainer, Dr. Vossius & Partner, Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96921491.5 | 07.06.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996US09948 | Priority number, date | US19950481941 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 481941 | US19960015502P | 09.02.1996 Original published format: US 15502 P | [1999/18] |
Former [1998/29] | US19950481941 | 07.06.1995 | |
US19960015502 | 09.02.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | US19950481941 | 07.06.1995 | |
US19960598776 | 09.02.1996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641865 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/56] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0833894 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0833894 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C12N9/90, C12N15/12, C12N15/10, C12N15/31, C12N15/62, C12N15/63, C12N15/85, C12N15/86, C07K14/395, C07K14/47 | [1998/15] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/15] | Title | German: | AUF RAPAMYCIN BASIERENDE REGULATION BIOLOGISCHER VORGÄNGE | [1998/15] | English: | RAPAMCYCIN-BASED REGULATION OF BIOLOGICAL EVENTS | [1998/15] | French: | REGULATION D'EVENEMENTS BIOLOGIQUES FONDEE SUR LA RAPAMYCINE | [1998/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | ES | 24.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9418317 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [DA] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9502684 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [DA] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [DPX]WO9533052 (MITOTIX INC [US]) [DPX] 36,37,39,45 * page 46, line 11 - page 47, line 28 * * page 47, line 29 - page 54, line 10 * * page 62, line 5 - page 63, line 30 *; | [T]WO9606111 (ARIAD GENE THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [T] 1-45 * cited in the application; page 94, line 1 - page 100, line 7 *; | [DA] - J.L. POMERANTZ ET AL., "Structure-based design of transcription factors", SCIENCE, AAAS,WASHINGTON,DC,US, (19950106), vol. 267, pages 93 - 96, XP002018160 [DA] 1-45 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7809612 | [DA] - J. CHEN ET AL., "Identification of an 11-kDa FKBP 12-rapamycin-binding domain within the 289-kDa FKBP-rapamycin-associated protein and characterization of a critical serine residue", PROC. NATL.ACAD SCI., NATL. ACAD SCI.,WASHINGTON,DC,US;, (199505), vol. 92, pages 4947 - 4051, XP002018161 [DA] 1-45 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.11.4947 | [T] - RIVERA, VICTOR M. ET AL, "A humanized system for pharmacologic control of gene expression", NAT. MED. (N. Y.) (1996), 2(9), 1028-1032 CODEN: NAMEFI;ISSN: 1078-8956, (199609), XP002018162 [T] 1-45 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0996-1028 | Examination | - CHIU ET AL, "RAPT1, a mammalian homolog of yeast Tor, interacts with the FKBP12 / rapamycin complex.", PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 12574 - 12578 |