EP1006935 - HIGH VISCOSITY LIQUID CONTROLLED DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Durect Corporation 10240 Bubb Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2005/12] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Southern Biosystems, Inc. 756 Tom Martin Drive Birmingham, AL 35211-4467 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIPTON, Arthur, J. 686 Summit Point Birmingham, AL 35226 / US | 02 /
HOLL, Richard, J. 1610 Cahaba Road Birmingham, AL 35223 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Boff, James Charles Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Boff, James Charles Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96921521.9 | 07.06.1996 | [2000/24] | WO1996US10055 | Priority number, date | US19950474337 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 474337 | US19950478450 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 478450 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9639995 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006935 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006935 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02, A61F6/06, A61F9/02, A61K9/20, A61K9/48, A61K9/70, A61L9/04 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
A61K9/0095 (EP);
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61K8/60 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K9/0024 (EP);
A61L15/20 (EP);
A61L15/44 (EP);
A61L24/0015 (EP);
A61L26/0066 (EP);
A61L27/54 (EP);
A61L31/16 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP);
A61L2300/236 (EP);
A61L2300/42 (EP);
A61L2300/602 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | KONTROLLIERTES ZUFÜHRSYSTEM MIT EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT VON HOHER VISKOSITÄT | [2000/24] | English: | HIGH VISCOSITY LIQUID CONTROLLED DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2000/24] | French: | SYSTEME D'ADMINISTRATION REGULEE D'UN LIQUIDE DE HAUTE VISCOSITE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 19.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.12.1997 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05075143.7 / EP1525858 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Request for further processing for: | 20.02.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.03.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.11.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 07.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/16] | LU | 30.06.2005 | |
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | MC | 30.06.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9003768 (SOUTHERN RES INST [US]) [AD] 1,7,8,10,13,14,16,19,23,31,43-45* claim - *; | [A]WO9303751 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1,7,8,10,13,14,16,18,23,31,39 * claim - * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 20 *; | [A]EP0535899 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1,7,8,10,13,14,16,19,23,31 * claim - * * page 4, line 38 - line 46 * * page 4, line 57 - page 5, line 5 *; | [A]EP0640336 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7,8,10,13,14,16,19,23,31 * claim - * * page 3, line 50 - line 52 * * page 4, line 45 - line 54 * * page 5, line 43 - line 53 *; | [XP]WO9517901 (MATRIX PHARMA [US]) [XP] 1,7,8,10,13,14,16,19,23,31 * claims 1,2,5,6,9,12,14,17,19,20,23,24 * * page 3, line 33 - page 5, line 33 * * page 6, line 14 - line 19 * * page 8, line 4 - line 13 * * page 9, line 27 - line 32 * | International search | [A]US5340572 (PATEL RAJESH [US], et al) |