EP0880855 - INTELLIGENT EPG MEMORY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/49] | INTELLIGENT MEMORY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2002/42] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Opposition rejected | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Video Properties, Inc. 7140 South Lewis Avenue Tulsa, OK 74136 / US | [2000/03] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states News America Publications, Inc. 1211 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 / US | ||
For all designated states Telecommunications of Colorado, Inc. 5619 DTC Parkway Englewood, CO 80111-3000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAZARUS, David, Beryl 7852 Spring Avenue Elkins Park, PA 19027 / US | 02 /
ELLIS, Michael, Dean 1300 Kingwood Place Boulder, CO 80304 / US | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Hale, Peter Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1998/49] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96921600.1 | 06.06.1996 | [1998/49] | WO1996US10282 | Priority number, date | US19950476451 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 476451 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641470 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0880855 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0880855 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/088, H04N7/16, H04N1/00 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
H04N21/4335 (EP,US);
H04N7/16 (KR);
H04N1/00098 (EP,US);
H04N21/23439 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N7/0884 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/49] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES EPG SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPEICHERSTEUERUNG | [2002/42] | English: | INTELLIGENT EPG MEMORY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2002/42] | French: | EPG PROCEDE ET SYSTEME INTELLIGENT DE GESTION MEMOIRE | [2002/42] |
Former [1998/49] | INTELLIGENTES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPEICHERSTEUERUNG | ||
Former [1998/49] | INTELLIGENT MEMORY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [1998/49] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME INTELLIGENT DE GESTION MEMOIRE | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.12.2003
19.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE IGR GmbH & Co. KG. Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.12.2003
19.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE IGR GmbH & Co. KG. Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.12.2003
19.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | 10.02.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.06.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.09.2004 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.03.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/25] | Appeal following opposition | 28.10.2004 | Appeal received No. T1278/04 | 13.01.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.03.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 21.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2003 | FI | 02.04.2003 | IE | 06.06.2003 | LU | 06.06.2003 | MC | 30.06.2003 | DK | 02.07.2003 | GR | 02.07.2003 | PT | 02.07.2003 | SE | 02.07.2003 | BE | 30.06.2004 | [2005/28] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
IE | 06.06.2003 | ||
LU | 06.06.2003 | ||
MC | 30.06.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
IE | 06.06.2003 | ||
LU | 06.06.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
IE | 06.06.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
DK | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
FI | 02.04.2003 | ||
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 02.07.2003 | |
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | PT | 02.07.2003 | |
SE | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 02.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9100670 (SUPERGUIDE CORP [US]); | [A]WO9414284 (DISCOVERY COMMUNICAT INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 5 - line 27 * * page 24, line 24 - page 27, line 9 * * page 51, line 19 - page 59, line 8 * * figures 1,2,7,9,11 *; | [X]WO9429811 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 2 * * page 7, line 29 - line 37 * * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 18 * * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 36 * * page 17, line 10 - page 19, line 18 * * page 23, line 28 - page 24, line 15 * * page 27, line 5 - page 29, line 4 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A] - CHERRICK S ET AL, "AN INDIVIDUALLU ADDRESSABLE TV RECEIVER WITH INTERACTIVE CHANNEL GUIDE DISPLAY, VCR, AND CABLE BOX CONTROL", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19940801), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 317 - 328, XP000471190 [A] 1-14 * page 322, column R, line 35 - page 325, column L, line 33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.320811 |