EP0840589 - EXERCISE BED FOR AESTHETIC AND SLIMMING TREATMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tron, Margherita Via Camaur, 17 34100 Trieste / IT | [1998/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 96922177.9 | 17.07.1996 | [1998/20] | WO1996IB00719 | Priority number, date | IT1995UD00144 | 21.07.1995 Original published format: IT UD950144 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9703633 | Date: | 06.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840589 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840589 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61H33/06 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
A61H33/06 (EP,US);
A61H2035/004 (EP,US);
A61H2201/10 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1261 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0659 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0663 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/20] | Extension states | SI | 28.01.1998 | Title | German: | BETT MIT TRAININGSEINRICHTUNGEN FÜR ÄSTHETIK- UND SCHLANKHEITSBEHANDLUNGEN | [1998/20] | English: | EXERCISE BED FOR AESTHETIC AND SLIMMING TREATMENTS | [1998/20] | French: | LIT D'EXERCICE POUR TRAITEMENTS ESTHETIQUES AMINCISSANTS | [1998/20] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 19.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.1999 | BE | 17.11.1999 | CH | 17.11.1999 | ES | 17.11.1999 | FI | 17.11.1999 | FR | 17.11.1999 | GR | 17.11.1999 | LI | 17.11.1999 | NL | 17.11.1999 | SE | 17.11.1999 | DK | 17.02.2000 | PT | 17.02.2000 | GB | 17.07.2000 | [2016/21] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
FI | 17.11.1999 | ||
FR | 17.11.1999 | ||
GR | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
DK | 17.02.2000 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
GB | 17.07.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
FI | 17.11.1999 | ||
GR | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
DK | 17.02.2000 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 17.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
FI | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
DK | 17.02.2000 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 17.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
FI | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 17.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
FI | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 17.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
FI | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 17.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
FI | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 17.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/28] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FI | 18.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 17.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FI | 18.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FI | 18.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FI | 18.02.2000 | ||
CH | 22.02.2000 | ||
LI | 22.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 17.11.1999 | |
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FI | 18.02.2000 | ||
CH | 22.02.2000 | ||
LI | 22.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 17.11.1999 | |
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FI | 18.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 18.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR953108 (VAN STEEN) [A] 1,3,5,6,14 * page 2, line 53 - line 60; figure . * * page 2, line 101 - line 104 *; | [A]FR2070503 (OULLIER YVES) [A] 1,12 * page 3, line 2 - line 14 *; | [A]FR2086905 (TOURNAY OMER) [A] 1,2,5,6 * page 3, line 5 - line 16; figure 3 *; | [A]US3741218 (NOVAK K) [A] 1,3,5-7,11 * column 2, line 19 - line 39; figure -; claims 5,6,8 *; | [Y]US4130120 (KOHLER JR HERBERT V) [Y] 1,4-6,17,19 * column 6, line 9 - line 16; figures 3,15,17,18 * * column 7, line 57 - line 60 * * column 8, line 45 - line 48 * * column 9, line 50 - line 60 *; | [A]GB2128488 (LACHAR ROYALTY MANAGEMENT CORP) [A] 1,17,19* figure -; claims 1,3,7 *; | [Y]FR2618342 (LACHAR ROYALTY MANAGEMENT CORP [NL]) [Y] 1,4-6,17,19 * page 8, line 16 - line 19; figure -; claims 1,4-6 *; | [A]US4998725 (WATTERSON SCOTT R [US], et al) [A] 20,21,23 * column 6, line 21 - line 34; claims 2,3 * |