EP0786857 - CONVERTER CIRCUIT TO WHICH SINE WAVE IS INPUTTED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Meidensha 1-17, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Meidensha 1-17, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAI, Yoshihiro, Gifu University 1-1, Yanagido Gifu-shi, Gifu 501-11 / JP | 02 /
TAKAYAMA, Junichi, Kabushiki Kaisha Meidensha 1-17, Osaki 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Thul, Stephan, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Thul, Stephan, et al MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & ROTERMUND Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96922248.8 | 05.07.1996 | [1997/31] | WO1996JP01879 | Priority number, date | JP19950173827 | 11.07.1995 Original published format: JP 17382795 | JP19950272339 | 20.10.1995 Original published format: JP 27233995 | JP19960026457 | 14.02.1996 Original published format: JP 2645796 | [1997/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9703494 | Date: | 30.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786857 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/217, H02M1/00 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
H02M1/4208 (EP,US);
H02M1/4216 (EP,US);
H02M7/217 (KR);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/31] | H02M7/217 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [1997/31] | Title | German: | WANDLERSCHALTKREIS MIT SINUSFÖRMIGER STROMAUFNAHME | [1997/31] | English: | CONVERTER CIRCUIT TO WHICH SINE WAVE IS INPUTTED | [1997/31] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CONVERSION ALIMENTE PAR UNE ONDE SINUSOIDALE | [1997/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1997 | Translation filed | 21.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 21.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 05.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/03] | 17.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]FR2679079 (FRONIUS SCHWEISSMASCH [AT]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 32 - page 23, line 3; figures 1-19 * [A] 3,7,8 [Y] 2; | [YA]EP0486875 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 2 * page 4, line 14 - page 10, line 9; figures 1,11,16 * [A] 1,8; | [XA]EP0442286 (USI LIGHTING INC [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 42; figures 1-3 * [A] 2; | [X]EP0460554 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 2 * column 9, line 53 - column 11, line 30; figures 7,8 *; | [X]EP0436980 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 26 - page 6, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0504094 (EMERSON ELECTRIC CO [US]) [A] 4,6,9,13,15 * column 3, line 35 - column 10, line 33; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE3829387 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [A] 4,13 * column 2, line 18 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0507663 (ARTUS [FR]) [A] 3 * column 4, line 13 - column 10, line 33; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4384321 (RIPPEL WALLY E) [A] 2 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 68; figure 1 * | [A] - GATARIC S ET AL, "SOFT-SWITCHED SINGLE-SWITCH THREE-PHASE RECTIFIER WITH POWER FACTORCORRECTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION (APEC), ORLANDO, FEB. 13 - 17, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940213), vol. 2, no. CONF. 9, pages 738 - 744, XP000467388 [A] 4-7 | [A] - SALMON J C, "CIRCUIT TOPOLOGIES FOR PWM BOOST RECTIFIERS OPERATED FROM 1-PHASE AND 3-PHASE AC SUPPLIES AND USING EITHER SINGLE OR SPLIT DC RAIL VOLTAGE OUTPUTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL APPLED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION. (APEC), DALLAS, MAR. 5 - 9, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950305), vol. 1, no. CONF. 10, ISBN 0-7803-2483-8, pages 473 - 479, XP000528170 [A] 3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.1995.468990 | International search | [X]JPS63154064 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [X]JPH06233541 (SONY CORP); | [X]JPH0731150 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG); | [X]JPH04140069 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [A]JPH0686539 (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPH0550993U ; | [A]JPS62159183U |