EP0880854 - BANDWIDTH EFFICIENT COMMUNICATION OF USER DATA IN DIGITAL TELEVISION DATA STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states General Instrument Corporation 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUBER, Ray 1311 Olivet Street La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
MORONEY, Paul 3411 Western Springs Road Olivenhain, CA 92024 / US | 03 /
HOOGENBOOM, Chris Apartment 190 26347 West Thousand Oaks Boulevard Calabasas, CA 91302 / US | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Schley, Jan Malte Fish & Richardson P.C. HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/49] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96922569.7 | 27.06.1996 | [1998/49] | WO1996US10840 | Priority number, date | US19950495369 | 28.06.1995 Original published format: US 495369 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701930 | Date: | 16.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0880854 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/087 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
H04N19/00 (EP,US);
H04N21/238 (KR);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4621 (EP,US);
H04N7/088 (EP,US);
H04N7/0885 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
H04N21/4884 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/49] | Title | German: | BANDBREITENEFFIZIENTE ÜBERTRAGUNG VON BENUTZERDATEN IN EINEM DIGITALFERNSEHDATENSTROM | [1998/49] | English: | BANDWIDTH EFFICIENT COMMUNICATION OF USER DATA IN DIGITAL TELEVISION DATA STREAM | [1998/49] | French: | TRANSMISSION, A BONNE OCCUPATION SPECTRALE, DE DONNEES UTILISATEUR DANS UN FLUX DE DONNEES DE TELEVISION NUMERIQUE | [1998/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1997 | Search fee paid | 26.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1997 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.10.1998 | 01.07.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.2000 | 30.06.2015 | 20   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4862268 (CAMPBELL JOHN G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9-11,14,15,17,19,21-24 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - line 64 * * column 3, line 9 - line 15 * * column 3, line 31 - line 37 * * column 6, line 31 - line 37 * * column 7, line 60 - line 66 * * column 13, line 27 - line 32 * * column 14, line 55 - column 15, line 2 * * column 17, line 27 - line 47 * * claims 1,2 * * figures 11,12 *; | [X]WO9515656 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [X] 1-4,7-12,14,15,17,19-24 * page 12, line 7 - line 16 * * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 5 * * page 17, line 10 - line 19 * * page 22, line 8 - line 19 * * claims 1,7,9,11,15,16 * * figures 4,6,8 *; | [XY]WO9515660 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [X] 1,4,7-12,17,20,21,24 * abstract * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 2 * * page 7, line 8 - line 11 * * page 12, line 32 - page 13, line 5 * * page 13, line 9 - line 15 * * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 6 * * page 15, line 12 - line 20 * * page 16, line 20 - line 22 * * page 17, line 4 - line 7 * * page 26, line 22 - line 29 * * page 29, line 24 - line 27 * * claims 5-10 * * figures 3,8,9 * [Y] 5,6,13,18,25; | [Y]US5425100 (THOMAS WILLIAM L [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,13,18,25 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 15 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 25 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9506391 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - line 26 * * page 4, line 16 - line 27 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 2 * * claims 1-4,6,8,9 * * figures 2,4,5 * | International search | [AE]US5493339 (BIRCH CHRISTOPHER H [US], et al); | [X]US4862268 (CAMPBELL JOHN G [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9515660 | EP0641131 |