EP0838051 - PULSE GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTS SYSTEMS CORPORATION 14000 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344-2290 / US | [1998/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Stephen, W. 108 Pinecroft Drive Raleigh, NC 27609 / US | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Patrice Vidon, Immeuble Germanium, 80, Avenue des Buttes-de-Coesmes 35700 Rennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 96922585.3 | 26.06.1996 | [1998/18] | WO1996US10901 | Priority number, date | US19950497210 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: US 497210 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702523 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0838051 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0838051 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/04, H02M3/07 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H02M3/07 (EP,US);
H03K17/063 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/18] | G06F1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE [1998/18] | Title | German: | IMPULSGEBER | [1998/18] | English: | PULSE GENERATOR | [1998/18] | French: | GENERATEUR D'IMPULSIONS | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 27.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63294254 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890328), vol. 13, no. 126, Database accession no. (E - 734), & JP63294254 A 19881130 (FUJI FACOM CORPORATION) [A] 1,3,7,11 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5095223 (THOMAS ALEXANDER C [GB]) |