20.10.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
28.10.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
21.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.02.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.09.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.09.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
27.08.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2004 |
First examination report |
|
16.04.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.07.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
31.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.07.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
29.10.1999 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] |
29.10.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] |
02.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.03.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] |
13.03.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] |
26.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|