Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0838051 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2005 | B1 | EP0838051 | 15.12.1999 | A4 | EP0838051 | 29.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9610901 | 26.06.1996 | US49721095 | 30.06.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69635580T | 31.08.2006 | T2 | DE69635580D1 | 19.01.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9610901 | 26.06.1996 | US49721095 | 30.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9702523 | Global Dossier | 23.01.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US49721095 | 30.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5587680 | 24.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US49721095 | 30.06.1995 |