EP0954677 - METHOD OF INCREASING THE AMOUNT OF HYDROCARBONS FROM AN UNDERGROUND RESERVOIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSAL ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Suite 102, 3033 Riviera Drive Naples, FL 33940 / US | [1999/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIPPETOE, William, W. 12409 South Memorial Drive Bixby, OK 74008 / US | 02 /
SHROFF, David, N. 2601 West Iola Broken Arrow, OK 74112 / US | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/45] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96922663.8 | 03.07.1996 | [1999/45] | WO1996US11331 | Priority number, date | US19950498086 | 05.07.1995 Original published format: US 498086 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702404 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954677 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/25, E21B43/267, E21B43/22, E21B43/26 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
E21B43/20 (EP,US);
C09K8/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ÖLFÖRDEMENGE UNTERIRDISCHER LAGERSTÄTTEN | [1999/45] | English: | METHOD OF INCREASING THE AMOUNT OF HYDROCARBONS FROM AN UNDERGROUND RESERVOIR | [1999/45] | French: | PROCEDE ACCROISSANT LA QUANTITE D'HYDROCARBURES EXTRAITS D'UN RESERVOIR SOUTERRAIN | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 28.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/05] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/13] | 28.01.1998 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 01.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/31] | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4342484 (DAVIDSON DONALD H, et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 24 - line 39 * | International search | [A]US2888988 (CLARK WILLIAM H); | [A]US3127935 (POETTMANN FRED H, et al); | [A]US4306981 (BLAIR JR CHARLES M) |