EP0834027 - HYDROSTATIC-MECHANICAL POWER DISTRIBUTION TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Allmannsweilerstrasse 25 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG Allmannsweilerstrasse 25 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | |||
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHLE, Hubert Eschstrasse 11 D-88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | 02 /
POHLENZ, Jürgen Mozartstrasse 57 D-88214 Ravensburg / DE | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Zietlow, Karl-Peter, et al ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | [1998/15] | Application number, filing date | 96922813.9 | 15.06.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996EP02590 | Priority number, date | DE1995122833 | 23.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19522833 | [1998/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701049 | Date: | 09.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0834027 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0834027 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16H47/04 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
F16H47/04 (EP,US);
F16H2037/0886 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [1998/15] | Title | German: | HYDROSTATISCH-MECHANISCHES LEISTUNGSVERZWEIGUNGSGETRIEBE | [1998/15] | English: | HYDROSTATIC-MECHANICAL POWER DISTRIBUTION TRANSMISSION | [1998/15] | French: | TRANSMISSION A DERIVATION DE PUISSANCE HYDROSTATIQUE--MECANIQUE | [1998/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2412761 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1 * page 12, line 15 - page 13, line 5; figure 5 *; | [A]GB2058254 (FORTSCHRITT VEB K) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0059055 (PARRAGA GARCIA JULIAN) [A] 1,4,5 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0513674 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 7 - page 8; figures 1,3 *; | [DA]DE4243018 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [DA] 1,3* column 2, line 54 - line 57; figure 1 * |