EP0836635 - Compositions of synthetic polymers and a polysilane derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/17] | POLYSILANES | ||
[2000/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
DE
FR
NL
Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | For:IT
Ciba Specialty Chemicals S.p.A. Via Pila, 6/3 Fraz. Pontecchio Marconi 40037 Sasso Marconi (BO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For:BE
DE
FR
NL
Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
For:IT
Ciba Specialty Chemicals S.p.A. Via Pila, 6/3, Fraz. Pontecchio Marconi 40037 Sasso Marconi (BO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARROZZA, Primo Via Calabria, 7 I-37193 Verona / IT | 02 /
BORZATTA, Valerio Via Novelli, 2 I-40127 Bologna / IT | 03 /
CHATGILIALOGLU, Chryssostomos Vicolo Mandria, 9 I-40126 Bologna / IT | [1998/17] | Application number, filing date | 96922855.0 | 20.06.1996 | [1998/17] | WO1996EP02667 | Priority number, date | EP19950810438 | 03.07.1995 Original published format: EP 95810438 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702322 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836635 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836635 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08G77/60, // (C08L101/00, 83:16) | [1998/17] | CPC: |
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C08L83/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/00, C08L83/00 (US,EP);
C08L23/02, C08L83/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1998/17] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen aus synthetischen Polymeren und einem Polysilanderivat. | [2000/47] | English: | Compositions of synthetic polymers and a polysilane derivative | [2000/47] | French: | Compositions de polymères synthétiques et d'un dérivé de polysilane | [2000/47] |
Former [1998/17] | POLYSILANE | ||
Former [1998/17] | POLYSILANES | ||
Former [1998/17] | POLYSILANES | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH04264132 ; | [A]JPH06122796 ; | [X]EP0152704 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 8-14 * examples 1-11 *; | [X]FR2616152 (INST RECH APPLIQUEE POLYM [FR]) [X] 8-14 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 27 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 44, Database accession no. 361941, XP002018631 & JPH04264132 A 19920918 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE CORP.) [X] 8-14 * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930202), vol. 17, no. 52, Database accession no. (C - 1022) [ ] * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 23, Database accession no. 186472, XP002018632 & JPH06122796 A 19940506 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] * abstract * | Examination | US4783495 |