EP0776454 - FLAT TUBE FOR A HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR S.A. 8, rue Louis-Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR 8, rue Louis-Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LETRANGE, Frédéric 23, rue Sainte-Geneviève F-92000 Nanterre / FR | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Bezault, Jean, et al Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Bezault, Jean, et al Cabinet Netter 40, rue Vignon 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96922944.2 | 18.06.1996 | [1997/23] | WO1996FR00939 | Priority number, date | FR19950007513 | 22.06.1995 Original published format: FR 9507513 | [1997/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701071 | Date: | 09.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776454 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776454 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/03, B21C37/15, F28F1/02 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
F28D1/0308 (EP,US);
F28D1/03 (KR);
B21C37/151 (EP,US);
F28F1/022 (EP,US);
Y10S165/906 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49391 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1997/23] | Title | German: | FLACHROHR FÜR EINEN WÄRMETAUSCHER | [1997/23] | English: | FLAT TUBE FOR A HEAT EXCHANGER | [1997/23] | French: | TUBE PLAT POUR ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [1997/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 23.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE805785 (FRIEDRICH KARL ROSENBAUM) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1573193 (FIVES-LILLE CAIL) [A] * figure 2 *; | [DA]EP0302232 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]) [DA] 1 * column A; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US4805693 (FLESSATE DENNIS S [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 2 * * column 6, line 39 - column 6, line 53 * |