EP0784882 - A POWER TRANSMISSION SYSTEM FOR HIGH-VOLTAGE DIRECT CURRENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | [1997/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASPLUND, Gunnar Vasagatan 15 S-771 32 Ludvika / SE | [1997/30] | Application number, filing date | 96923126.5 | 06.06.1996 | [1997/30] | WO1996SE00744 | Priority number, date | SE19950002450 | 06.07.1995 Original published format: SE 9502450 | [1997/30] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702639 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0784882 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0784882 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/36, H02M3/135 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
H02J3/36 (EP,US);
Y02E60/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/30] | Title | German: | HOCHSPANNUNGSGLEICHSTROMÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [1997/30] | English: | A POWER TRANSMISSION SYSTEM FOR HIGH-VOLTAGE DIRECT CURRENT | [1997/30] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSPORT D'ELECTRICITE POUR COURANT CONTINU A HAUTE TENSION | [1997/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1997 | Translation filed | 03.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 17.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.08.1999 | SE | 18.08.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 18.08.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4259713 (FLISBERG GUNNAR, et al); | [A]WO9016104 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]); | [A]WO9515605 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE], et al) |