EP0843734 - INTEGRATED NUCLEIC ACID DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Affymetrix, Inc. (a California Corporation) 3380 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2003/13] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states Affymetrix, Inc. 3380 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Rolfe, C. 306 Windmill Park Lane Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
LIPSHUTZ, Robert, J. 970 Palo Alto Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 03 /
RAVA, Richard, P. 1091 Danbury Drive San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 04 /
FODOR, Stephen, P., A. 3863 Nathan Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/22] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96923572.0 | 27.06.1996 | [1998/22] | WO1996US11147 | Priority number, date | US19950000859 | 03.07.1995 Original published format: US 859 | US19950000703 | 29.07.1995 Original published format: US 703 | US19960589027 | 19.01.1996 Original published format: US 589027 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702357 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0843734 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0843734 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/34, C12M1/40 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
B01F31/65 (EP,US);
B01F31/86 (EP,US);
B01F33/30 (EP,US);
B01F35/71 (EP,US);
B01F35/712 (EP,US);
B01F35/71745 (EP,US);
B01F35/71761 (EP,US);
B01F35/718 (EP,US);
B01F35/71805 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
B01L3/502723 (EP,US);
B01L3/50273 (EP,US);
B01L3/502738 (EP,US);
B01L3/502746 (EP,US);
B01L3/502784 (EP,US);
G01N35/1095 (EP,US);
B01F2101/23 (EP,US);
B01F2101/44 (EP,US);
B01F33/25 (EP,US);
B01F33/45 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0621 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0684 (EP,US);
B01L2200/10 (EP,US);
B01L2300/087 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0883 (EP,US);
B01L2300/16 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0415 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0421 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
B01L2400/049 (EP,US);
B01L2400/084 (EP,US);
B01L2400/086 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
B01L3/502753 (EP,US);
B01L9/527 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00158 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/118339 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/22] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE NUKLEINSÄURE-DIAGNOSTIK VORRICHTUNG | [1998/22] | English: | INTEGRATED NUCLEIC ACID DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE | [1998/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC NUCLEOTIDIQUE INTEGRE | [1998/22] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1998 | Search fee paid | 03.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 09.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03000459.2 / EP1304388 | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 26.03.2003 | GR | 26.03.2003 | DK | 26.06.2003 | PT | 26.06.2003 | SE | 26.06.2003 | MC | 30.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/23] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 26.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0109278 (TECHNICON INSTR [US]) [A] 88,89 * page 19, line 3 - line 9; figures 4A-4D * * page 20, line 13 - line 20 *; | [A]US4676274 (BROWN JAMES F [US]) [A] 1,84,90 * column 3, line 45 - line 65 * * column 9, line 57 - line 64; figure 13 ** column 12, line 23 - line 60; figure 18 *; | [A]US5230866 (SHARTLE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 2,3,1,90 * column 18, line 5 - column 19, line 28 * * column 15, line 15 - line 55 * | International search | [Y]US4426451 (COLUMBUS RICHARD L [US]); | [A]US5252294 (KROY WALTER [DE], et al); | [Y]WO9405414 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [Y]US5304487 (WILDING PETER [US], et al); | [Y]US5384261 (WINKLER JAMES L [US], et al); | [YP]US5498392 (WILDING PETER [US], et al) | [Y] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., November 1994, Vol. 91, WOOLLEY et al., "Ultra-High Speed DNA Fragment Separations Using Microfabricated Capillary Array Electrophoresis Chips", pages 11348-11352. |