EP0838045 - MAKING A PHOTOPOLYMER PRINTING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyfibron Technologies, Inc. 5210 Phillip Lee Drive Atlanta Georgia 30336-2293 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states Polyfibron Technologies, Inc. 5210 Phillip Lee Drive Atlanta, Georgia 30336-2293 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINGER, Lori 3559 W. Hampton Drive Marietta, GA 30064 / US | 02 /
ROSEN, Dan 1042 Justice Lane Acworth, GA 30102 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, Raymond, E. 3807 Foxwood Road Duluth, GA 30136 / US | 04 /
BOYCE, Howard, B. 1760 Dear Run Drive Conyers, GA 30208 / US | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96923595.1 | 02.07.1996 | [1998/18] | WO1996US11185 | Priority number, date | US19950502307 | 13.07.1995 Original published format: US 502307 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9703382 | Date: | 30.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0838045 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/30 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
B01D61/145 (EP);
C02F1/444 (EP);
G03F7/3092 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/18] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINER PHOTOPOLYMERDRUCKPLATTE | [1998/18] | English: | MAKING A PHOTOPOLYMER PRINTING PLATE | [1998/18] | French: | FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION PORTANT UN PHOTOPOLYMERE | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 14.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 20.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/46] | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3143106 (BASF AG) [X] 1,2,4,5,11-16 * page 6, line 24 - line 31; claim 1 * | International search | [X]US4786417 ; | [Y]US5171767 ; | [Y]US5328805 ; | [Y]US4239368 ; | [Y]US5124736 ; | [YP]WO9606382 |