EP0801622 - TUB CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIVERWOOD INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 3350 Cumberland Circle, Suite 1400 Atlanta Georgia 30339 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states RIVERWOOD INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 3350 Cumberland Circle, Suite 1400 Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HINE, Neal 74 Kiel Avenue Butler, NJ 07405 / US | 02 /
NAUMANN, Frederick 26 Amelia Drive Old Tapplan, NJ 07675 / US | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Grättinger & Partner Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96923638.9 | 02.07.1996 | [1997/43] | WO1996US11269 | Priority number, date | US19950554955 | 13.11.1995 Original published format: US 554955 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718142 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801622 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801622 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/44 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
B65D71/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT [1997/43] | Title | German: | SCHALENTRÄGER | [1997/43] | English: | TUB CARRIER | [1997/43] | French: | SUPPORT POUR DES POTS | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 16.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 27.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 05.04.2004 | GB | 02.07.2004 | BE | 31.07.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/51] | GB | 02.07.2004 | |
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | GB | 02.07.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3166190 (CONRADES DAVID E) [Y] 2-7 * column 3, line 22 - line 39; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US5139147 (SUTHERLAND ROBERT L [US]) [Y] 2-7 * column 2, line 39 - line 68; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5163548 (DOMANSKY PHILIPPE [FR]) [Y] 2-7* abstract *; | [XA]WO9314992 (RIVERWOOD INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-7 | International search | [Y]US3166190 (CONRADES DAVID E); | [Y]GB1295518 ; | [A]US3756394 (HUAULT J); | [Y]US4703856 (CHAUSSADAS JEAN [FR]); | [A]US4703847 (OLIFF JAMES R [US]); | [Y]US5139147 (SUTHERLAND ROBERT L [US]); | [Y]US5163548 (DOMANSKY PHILIPPE [FR]) |